NY S04364 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4364C
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires registration of new automotive broker businesses; enacts various provisions relating to conduct of such businesses; defines certain deceptive practices; establishes rights of action and penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires registration of new automotive broker businesses; enacts various provisions relating to conduct of such businesses; defines certain deceptive practices; establishes rights of action and penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 4364C
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 4364B
2019-06-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-05-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-05-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 4364A
2019-05-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06655 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - print number 6655d

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04364&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04364&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04364
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04364&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04364A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04364&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04364B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04364&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04364C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4364#SC1

Bill Comments

feedback