NY S04375 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.21
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.519
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.158
2018-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a7237b
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4375A
2018-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1113
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-07Assemblyreferred to higher education
2017-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.634
2017-02-10SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07237 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s4375a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04375&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04375&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04375
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04375&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04375A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4375#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4375#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4375#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S4375#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04375&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback