NY S04378 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Title
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4378A |
2020-01-27 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-27 | Senate | recommitted to ways and means |
2020-01-27 | Senate | substitution reconsidered |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.218 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | substituted for a5661 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-01-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.136 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a5661 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.901 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05661 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to ways and means