NY S04385 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4385A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4385A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the school energy efficiency program which shall construct a proposal to streamline the approval process for the installation of energy efficiency projects in public schools.
Title
Establishes the school energy efficiency program which shall construct a proposal to streamline the approval process for the installation of energy efficiency projects in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4385A |
2016-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2015-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05976 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - print number 5976a