NY S04389 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on December 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-09 - APPROVAL MEMO.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on December 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-09 - APPROVAL MEMO.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits household cleansing products, cosmetic products and personal care products that contain 1,4-dioxane.
Title
Prohibits household cleansing products, cosmetic products and personal care products that contain 1,4-dioxane.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.34 |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.613 |
2019-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.528 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6295a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1548 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4389B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4389A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06295 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - APPROVAL MEMO.34