NY S04392 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Broome county to impose an additional surcharge to pay for the costs associated with updating the telecommunication equipment and telephone services needed to provide an enhanced 911 emergency telephone system to serve such county and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes Broome county to impose an additional surcharge to pay for the costs associated with updating the telecommunication equipment and telephone services needed to provide an enhanced 911 emergency telephone system to serve such county and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Senate | signed chap.120 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1549 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4392 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.261 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6546 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1549 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06546 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - signed chap.120