NY S04397 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires semiautomatic pistols manufactured or delivered to any licensed dealer in this state to be capable of microstamping ammunition; establishes fines for violations of this requirement.
Title
Requires semiautomatic pistols manufactured or delivered to any licensed dealer in this state to be capable of microstamping ammunition; establishes fines for violations of this requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-06-03 | AMENDED 4397A | |
2009-06-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.572 | |
2009-04-22 | REFERRED TO CODES |