NY S04397 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Mount Vernon to offer certain retirement options to Christopher Grieco, Wendell Griffin, Patsy Leone and Jeremy Villanueva, police officers employed by such city.
Title
Authorizes the city of Mount Vernon to offer certain retirement options to Christopher Grieco, Wendell Griffin, Patsy Leone and Jeremy Villanueva, police officers employed by such city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6569 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.836 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06569 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - signed chap.383