NY S04415 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for all-night liquor licenses to notify local community boards of their intent to apply for such licenses.
Title
Requires applicants for all-night liquor licenses to notify local community boards of their intent to apply for such licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1339 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1661 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01339 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - signed chap.396