NY S04419 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Chenango to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to four percent.
Title
Authorizes the county of Chenango to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to four percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | signed chap.698 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1502 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4419 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.355 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6548 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1502 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06548 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.698