NY S04421 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to criminal mischief in the third degree and criminal mischief in the second degree.
Title
Relates to criminal mischief in the third degree and criminal mischief in the second degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1471 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03253 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - advanced to third reading cal.626