NY S04449 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making permanent provisions for charging a fee for admission to the New York Botanical Garden.
Title
Relates to making permanent provisions for charging a fee for admission to the New York Botanical Garden.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.148 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.141 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5949 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.442 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05949 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.148