NY S04453 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes age, national origin and sexual orientation as constitutional protections against discrimination.
Title
Includes age, national origin and sexual orientation as constitutional protections against discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-04-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |