NY S04468 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Jonathan Grossman to apply for a recalculation of his retirement benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Jonathan Grossman to apply for a recalculation of his retirement benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1139
2019-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-29SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06660 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - referred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback