NY S04477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to webpage access to any mobile application used to search for veterans' services.
Title
Relates to webpage access to any mobile application used to search for veterans' services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.488 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.429 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a6792a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.770 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4477A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A06792 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.488