NY S04495 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.231
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automobile tire inflation machines; vests jurisdiction over automobile tire inflation machines with the state.
Title
Relates to automobile tire inflation machines; vests jurisdiction over automobile tire inflation machines with the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.231 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5819a |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4495A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.911 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A05819 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.231