NY S04497 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the rare disease advisory council; advise and consult on policy matters relating to rare disease; twenty-one appointed members.
Title
Establishes the rare disease advisory council; advise and consult on policy matters relating to rare disease; twenty-one appointed members.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.66 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.719 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.864 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4497 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.350 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-02 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-19 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5762 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.864 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05762 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.66