NY S04517 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts East Syracuse Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts East Syracuse Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.560
2019-03-14SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06870 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback