NY S04518 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the Schenectady county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Schenectady.
Title
Relates to authorizing the Schenectady county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Schenectady.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6527 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.423 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06527 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - signed chap.442