NY S04519 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to information cable television companies must provide to subscribers regarding availability of required equipment at retail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to information cable television companies must provide to subscribers regarding availability of required equipment at retail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4519A
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.439
2019-03-14SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01416 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback