NY S04520 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 4520A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 4520A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a small farm modernization fund program and a small farm modernization fund.
Title
Relates to creating a small farm modernization fund program and a small farm modernization fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4520A |
2014-05-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07037 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES