NY S04524 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to school bus safety cameras; relates to owner liability for failure of operator to stop for a school bus displaying a red visual signal and stop-arm; authorizes school districts to enter into agreements with municipalities for the installation and use of school bus photo violation monitoring systems; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to school bus safety cameras; relates to owner liability for failure of operator to stop for a school bus displaying a red visual signal and stop-arm; authorizes school districts to enter into agreements with municipalities for the installation and use of school bus photo violation monitoring systems; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | Senate | signed chap.145 |
2019-07-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.408 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4524B |
2019-05-13 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4950b |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.40 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | rules report cal.40 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-08 | Senate | print number 4950a |
2019-03-08 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-12 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-06 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4950B |
2019-05-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4524B |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.408 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4524A |
2019-04-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04950 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - signed chap.145