NY S04536 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments to rural hospitals designated as critical access hospitals.
Title
Relates to payments to rural hospitals designated as critical access hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1832 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4536A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.753 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06234 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
A10572 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to health
A10572 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to health