NY S04543 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a state workforce fuel reduction and conservation program which will develop and assist in implementing strategies to reduce fuel consumption by the state's motor vehicle fleet and to reduce solo trips between work and home by state employees; requires reporting to the governor and legislature.
Title
Provides for a state workforce fuel reduction and conservation program which will develop and assist in implementing strategies to reduce fuel consumption by the state's motor vehicle fleet and to reduce solo trips between work and home by state employees; requires reporting to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.352 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |