NY S04566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting legislative staff to visit correctional facilities and removes the exception from visiting facilities in which inmates under sentence of death are confined.
Title
Relates to permitting legislative staff to visit correctional facilities and removes the exception from visiting facilities in which inmates under sentence of death are confined.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.274 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.633 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4566 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-05-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.268 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-21 | Senate | referred to correction |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6849 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.633 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06849 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.274