NY S04570 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Board of Fire Commissioners of the East Northport Fire District to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Board of Fire Commissioners of the East Northport Fire District to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-05-20AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-20SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-05-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4570B
2019-05-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-05-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-06Assemblyreferred to real property taxation
2019-05-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4570A
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.388
2019-03-15SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04570
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04570A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04570&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04570B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4570#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4570#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4570#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback