NY S04573 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to decreasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain individuals who lose their jobs due to a labor dispute, such as a strike, and who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits; decreases the suspension period from seven consecutive weeks to seven consecutive calendar days; and permits the waiting period to be served during a suspension period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to decreasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain individuals who lose their jobs due to a labor dispute, such as a strike, and who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits; decreases the suspension period from seven consecutive weeks to seven consecutive calendar days; and permits the waiting period to be served during a suspension period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.645
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6592
2019-05-01Assemblyreferred to labor
2019-05-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.447
2019-03-15SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A06592 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4573

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback