NY S04578 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - PRINT NUMBER 4578B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes individuals to participate in the NY State of Health marketplace without providing information regarding citizenship or lawful residency or requesting or receiving a state or federal subsidy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes individuals to participate in the NY State of Health marketplace without providing information regarding citizenship or lawful residency or requesting or receiving a state or federal subsidy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 4578B
2019-05-10SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2019-03-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 4578A
2019-03-18SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2019-03-15SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A06791 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - print number 6791a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback