NY S04585 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the length of time to pay delinquent taxes in installments to thirty-six months.
Title
Expands the length of time to pay delinquent taxes in installments to thirty-six months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.265 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1317 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4585 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.343 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4420 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1317 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04420 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.265