NY S04609 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies procedures for the closure and/or decertification of assisted living residences; requires written notice and department approval and shall include timetables.
Title
Specifies procedures for the closure and/or decertification of assisted living residences; requires written notice and department approval and shall include timetables.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED 4609A |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.743 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03050 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - REFERRED TO AGING