NY S04611 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-06 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that members of a public pension or retirement system convicted of a felony involving breach of public trust be subject to forfeiture of pension benefits, rights and privileges.
Title
Provides that members of a public pension or retirement system convicted of a felony involving breach of public trust be subject to forfeiture of pension benefits, rights and privileges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2015-03-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.318 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06722 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - ordered to third reading rules cal.512