NY S04622 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting combination last name changes to occur when separated by a space, currently it is only allowed if separated by a hyphen.
Title
Relates to permitting combination last name changes to occur when separated by a space, currently it is only allowed if separated by a hyphen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.497 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.354 |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4622 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.110 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-03-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3487 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.354 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03487 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.497