NY S04629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mortgagees from requiring mortgagors of certain real property to purchase flood insurance exceeding a coverage amount that exceeds the outstanding mortgage thereon, or that includes coverage for contents.
Title
Prohibits mortgagees from requiring mortgagors of certain real property to purchase flood insurance exceeding a coverage amount that exceeds the outstanding mortgage thereon, or that includes coverage for contents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Assembly | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-12-28 | Assembly | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2020-12-28 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.146 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4629A |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.183 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.508 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-22 | Senate | print number 4770a |
2019-04-22 | Senate | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4770A |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.146 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1769 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4629A |
2019-05-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04770 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES