NY S04644 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "The Domestic Violence Protection Act - Brittany's Law" requiring registration of violent felony offenders; sets forth duties of the division of criminal justice services; establishes a special telephone number; requires the division to maintain a subdirectory of violent predators.
Title
Enacts "The Domestic Violence Protection Act - Brittany's Law" requiring registration of violent felony offenders; sets forth duties of the division of criminal justice services; establishes a special telephone number; requires the division to maintain a subdirectory of violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05889 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to correction
S06721 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06721 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN