NY S04649 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding dysmenorrhea as a covered condition for lawful medical use of marihuana.
Title
Relates to adding dysmenorrhea as a covered condition for lawful medical use of marihuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.602 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00688 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.32