NY S04654 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4654A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4654A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the sexual assault nurse examiner and sexual assault forensic examiner grant program to award grants to provide statewide access to services provided by sexual assault nurse examiners and sexual assault forensic examiners to victims of sexual assault.
Title
Establishes the sexual assault nurse examiner and sexual assault forensic examiner grant program to award grants to provide statewide access to services provided by sexual assault nurse examiners and sexual assault forensic examiners to victims of sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | PRINT NUMBER 4654A | |
2010-04-16 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A471 (Same As) 2010-04-19 - print number 471a