NY S04655 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a one-stop farming hotline with the Cornell cooperative extension.
Title
Establishes a one-stop farming hotline with the Cornell cooperative extension.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.469 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.733 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A06490 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture