NY S04664 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.150
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.150
Summary
Extends the provisions of the New York state sea level rise task force.
Title
Extends the provisions of the New York state sea level rise task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Foley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7894 | |
2009-06-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-27 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.441 | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07894 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.150
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04664&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |