NY S04676 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4676B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4676B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing counties to set interest rates imposed on late payment of property taxes and delinquencies and redemption of property subject to more than one tax lien.
Title
Relates to authorizing counties to set interest rates imposed on late payment of property taxes and delinquencies and redemption of property subject to more than one tax lien.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4676B |
2020-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.794 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4676A |
2019-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A04863 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to real property taxation