NY S04695 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensing of vision impairment specialists.
Title
Provides for the licensing of vision impairment specialists.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.829 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06875 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education