NY S04699 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.220
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study relating to the number of emergency room beds in the state and to make recommendations on the minimum number of emergency rooms required per capita and the maximum distance patients shall be expected to travel to access emergency room services.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to conduct a study relating to the number of emergency room beds in the state and to make recommendations on the minimum number of emergency rooms required per capita and the maximum distance patients shall be expected to travel to access emergency room services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.220 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.380 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a6832 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1141 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06832 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.220