NY S04704 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of social services to develop and provide training to intake workers at homeless shelters focused on how to identify and provide appropriate referrals to those suffering from mental health issues.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of social services to develop and provide training to intake workers at homeless shelters focused on how to identify and provide appropriate referrals to those suffering from mental health issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A06646 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to social services