NY S04711 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4711A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4711A
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory jail time of no less than thirty days for repeat violators of orders of protection.
Title
Requires mandatory jail time of no less than thirty days for repeat violators of orders of protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4711A |
2020-01-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1603 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10787 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - referred to judiciary