NY S04721 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-13 - APPROVAL MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the commissioner of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services.
Title
Relates to the powers of the commissioner of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.8 |
2013-11-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.507 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.96 |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a2270a |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2013-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED 4721A |
2013-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.568 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A02270 (Same As) 2013-06-05 - substituted by s4721a