NY S04721 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4721A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4721A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a certified transitional tax credit for taxpayers that demonstrate their agricultural products were sold during a period of transition into USDA organic certification, under the Whole Foods Market IP. L.P. "responsibly grown" labelling program, or under the QAI and Hesco, Inc. "certified transitional" label.
Title
Relates to the creation of a certified transitional tax credit for taxpayers that demonstrate their agricultural products were sold during a period of transition into USDA organic certification, under the Whole Foods Market IP. L.P. "responsibly grown" labelling program, or under the QAI and Hesco, Inc. "certified transitional" label.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4721A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.450 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07368 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - print number 7368a