NY S04724 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants William J. Cooley additional service credit within the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Grants William J. Cooley additional service credit within the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.235 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.624 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6977 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1428 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06977 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.235