NY S04731 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4731A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4731A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of a missing or non-functional airbag for certain vehicles at resale or auction.
Title
Requires disclosure of a missing or non-functional airbag for certain vehicles at resale or auction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4731A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05272 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - print number 5272a