NY S04734 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 4734A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the payment of ordinary disability retirement benefits by the New York state teachers' retirement system to Christine M. Allen, the widow of Lawrence L. Allen, if she shall file an application for such benefits with the retirement board of such retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the payment of ordinary disability retirement benefits by the New York state teachers' retirement system to Christine M. Allen, the widow of Lawrence L. Allen, if she shall file an application for such benefits with the retirement board of such retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 4734A
2016-03-07SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2015-04-13SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06985 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - held for consideration in governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback