NY S04735 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Michael E. Petroski to join the optional twenty year retirement plan, town of Glenville, county of Schenectady.
Title
Allows Michael E. Petroski to join the optional twenty year retirement plan, town of Glenville, county of Schenectady.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.271 |
2013-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6811a |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1443 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4735A |
2013-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06811 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - substituted by s4735a