NY S04736 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the presumed "cost of the agent" for purposes of cigarette marketing.
Title
Increases the presumed "cost of the agent" for purposes of cigarette marketing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1192 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4736A |
2012-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1469 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08019 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means